Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fl Dept Of Revenue Obo Jerrica, Hampton, Jerrica Jakia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Schneider, Pamela A, against Meeks, Cortez Vashawn, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING GENETIC TISSUE TYPING RESULTS | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER AND ORDER FOR DNA TESTING | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK MINUTES | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING VIA VIDEO CONFERCING OR TELEPHONE (WITH NOTARY PRESENT TITLE IV-D DOCKET) | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 7/11/2023 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge OFFICER HEARING presiding. | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.