Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Smith, Christine Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Smith, Buddy Lawn, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 5/18/2023 0330 PM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 5/22/2023 | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NTC OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CAUSE FOR ZZOM NON JURY TRIAL | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 5/18/2023 at 0330 PM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding. | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.