Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with BROWNING III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBROWNING III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 03, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2023002848 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 402023CP000046CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/3/2023 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER, CONSENT & JOINDER - RANDALL ESTERBROOK | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER, CONSENT & JOINDER - RICHARD ESTERBROOK | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER, CONSENT & JOINDER - PAMELA W. HAFEZI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.