Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Centra Ncfl Properties Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Kiser, Amy Marie, against Bailey, James R, Mason, Victor W, S And S Senior Housing Of Burn, S And S Senior Housing Of Loui, S And S Senior Housing Of Madi, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
|
ISSUED SUMMONS STEVE HALL CARPET & TILE
Date: May 08, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS S & S SENIOR HOUSING OF BURNSVILLE LLC
Date: May 08, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: May 08, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: May 08, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 08, 2023DESIGNATION OF EMAIL
Date: May 08, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE USA
Date: May 12, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS S & S SENIOR HOUSING OF LOUISBURG LLC
Date: May 08, 2023NTC OF LIS PENDENS
Date: May 08, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS VICTOR MASON
Date: May 08, 2023REAL PROPERTY VALUE CLAIM
Date: May 08, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE STEVE HALL CARPET & TILE
Date: May 12, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE STATE OF FLA DOR
Date: May 15, 2023DESIGNATION OF EMAIL
Date: May 12, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE KENNTH M. SIMONS (UNSERVED)
Date: May 17, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS S & S SENIOR HOUSING OF MADISON LLC
Date: May 08, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: May 08, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS KENNETH SIMONS
Date: May 08, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS JAMES BAILEY
Date: May 08, 2023ANSWER OF DEF, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE IRS
Date: May 12, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS STATE OF FLORIDA DOR
Date: May 08, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE VICTOR W MASON (UNSERVED)
Date: May 17, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC SVC ADDRESS
Date: June 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE JAMES R. BAILEY (UNSERVED)
Date: May 17, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS KENNETH MARK SIMONS
Date: July 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE S&S SENIOR OF BURNISHVILLE
Date: May 22, 2023DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE S&S SENIOR HOUSEING OF MADISON
Date: May 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #2 (UNSERVED)
Date: May 17, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS JAMES R BAILEY
Date: July 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE S&S HOUSING OF LOUISBURG
Date: May 19, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS VICTOR W MASON
Date: July 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #1(UNSERVED)
Date: May 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE KENNETH SIMONS
Date: August 04, 2023CORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTY AND RECIEPT FOR THE LIS PENDENS
Date: June 28, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE JAMES BAILEY
Date: July 25, 2023REPLY TO DEF'S ANSWER TO COMPLAITN FOR FORECLOSURE
Date: August 02, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & REQ FOR NOT OF PLEADINGS & NOTICES
Date: June 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE VICTOR MASON
Date: August 02, 2023PTLIF'S RESPONSE TO 1ST REQ FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 31, 2023RESPONSE TO DEF'S ANSWER TO COPMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE
Date: August 02, 2023ISSUED SUMMONS TROY & JENNY ENTERPRISES INC
Date: October 16, 2023NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING
Date: June 14, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEF'S 1ST REQ FOR PRODUCTION TO PTLIF
Date: August 03, 2023ANSWER OF DEF STEVE ALL CARPET & TITLE LLC
Date: June 20, 2023AGREED ORDER EXTEDNING TIME FOR FILING RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT (UNSIGNED)
Date: June 15, 2023AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING RESPONSE TO CONPLAINT
Date: June 16, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2023PTLF'S NOT OF PRODUCTION OF ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS
Date: September 15, 2023MOTION TO STRIKE DEF'S ANSWER & AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSE
Date: October 20, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 30, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR STEVE ALL CARPET
Date: June 20, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE TROY & JENNY ENTERPRISES
Date: October 25, 2023DEF'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEF S&S SENIOR HOUSING OF MADISON LLC
Date: October 19, 2023TROY & JENNY ENTERPRISES, INC'S ANSWER TO PTLIF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE
Date: October 06, 2023DEF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION
Date: November 20, 2023CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE DOUGLAS
Date: September 05, 2023MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE
Date: September 05, 2023REPLY TO DEF'S ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 08, 2023ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2023REPLY TO DEF'S ANSWER & AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 6/27/2023 0330 PM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 7/7/2023 | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 1/3/2021 at 0330 PM, MX - Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding. | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 1/3/2024 at 0330 PM, MX - Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding. | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DEF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE TROY & JENNY ENTERPRISES | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE DEF'S ANSWER & AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSE | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEF'S ANSWER & AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSES | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DEF'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEF S&S SENIOR HOUSING OF MADISON LLC | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ISSUED SUMMONS TROY & JENNY ENTERPRISES INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.