Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Abbott, Sarah, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ball, Angela Martha, against Abbott, Brandon, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S DESIGNATION OF EMAIL | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S DESIGNATION OF EMAIL | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 10/14/2021 0130 PM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 10/27/2021 | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL JUDGMENT | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF FL D.L. | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | HUSBAND'S FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | WIFE'S FINANCIAL AFFD | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | HUSBAND'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.