Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Craddock, Demishia Straughter, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Craddock, Kendrick Mendes, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 3/2/2023 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 3/2/2023 | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 1/19/2023 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 1/20/2023 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 3/2/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding. | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S CERTFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 1/19/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.