Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dondrea Daniel Fudge, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Marable, Tmiran Aaron, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 12/4/2023 | |
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF RETURN OF NON-SERVICE | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ISSUED SUMMONS | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S ENTRY OF SERVICE | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUED SUMMONS | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Reopened for OTHER on 11/8/2021 | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 402021DR000139DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/14/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.