Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Neal, Christopher Delaney, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hopkins, Vontresa, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 10/12/2021 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 10/15/2021 | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL VONTIESA HOPKINS (RESENT TO PO BOX 442 GREENVILLE, FLORIDA 32331) | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING VIA VIDECONFERENICNG (WITH NOTARY PRESENT) | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 10/12/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding. | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL VONTRESA HOPKINS | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM COURT ADMINISTRATION | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G assigned | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 402021DR000128DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/23/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.