Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Smith, Elizabeth L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bishop, Conrad C, against Smith, Keith E, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 12/13/2021 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results CANCELLED on 12/13/2021 | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HRG | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 12/13/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding. | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | FORMER WIFE'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 9/24/2021 1030 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 9/28/2021 | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | WIFE'S EXHBITS | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 8/9/2021 1100 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 8/11/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.