Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Stewart, Evelyn Frances, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Steve Hermanson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Name Change |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | DECREE CHANGING NAME IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of EVELYN FRANCES STEWART (PETITIONER) | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTES D ESPEY: HONORABLE RENEE C. DAY PRESIDING. PETITION FOR NAME CHANGE. MATTER CALLED AT 9:08 A.M. STAFF PRESENT: REPORTER MARCY BOLD, COURTROM CLERK D. ESPEY, AND BAILIFF E.R. BOWERS. DEFENDANT IS PRESENT. THERE ARE NO OTHER APPEARANCES. COURT FINDS ALL NOTICES REQUIRED BY LAW HAVE BEEN GIVEN. COURT FINDS NO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED CHANGE OF NAME WER MADE. REQUEST FOR CHANGE OF NAME IS GRANTED. ORDER EXECUTED AND TAKEN TO PROCESSING OFFICE. | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of EVELYN FRANCES STEWART (PETITIONER) | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME scheduled for 05/24/2021 at 8:30 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME Date: 05/28/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 1
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION. FILED BY ATTORNEY DAVID FOYIL BEHAF OF EVELYN FRANCES STEWART. | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CLETS REPORT RECEIVED FROM SHERIFF AND FILED | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of EVELYN FRANCES STEWART (PETITIONER) | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME Date: 05/24/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 1 Result: CONTINUED ON COURT'S MOTION
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CLETS REPORT TO SHERIFF ISSUED | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME Receipt: 262909 Date: 03/23/2021 IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of EVELYN FRANCES STEWART (PETITIONER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.