Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mca Fixed Payment Llc Dba Reli, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Deshmukh, Viraj Prashant, against R L Stalvey Trucking Llc, Stalvey, Rodney, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with Melissa G. Olin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2019 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 27, 2019CONTRACTS & INDEBTEDNESS COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2019ISSUED SUMMONS RL STALVEY TRUCKING
Date: March 27, 2019ISSUED SUMMONS RODNEY STALVEY
Date: March 27, 2019UNSERVED RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 15, 2019VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WTHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: October 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WTHOUT PREJUDICE | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | UNSERVED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 4/8/2019 | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | CONTRACTS & INDEBTEDNESS COMPLAINT | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ISSUED SUMMONS RL STALVEY TRUCKING | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ISSUED SUMMONS RODNEY STALVEY | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 402019CA000027CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/27/2019 | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.