Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ally Bank, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Houchins, Andrew Wayne, against Tuten, Amon C, Tuten, Renee B, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 27, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL
Date: March 27, 2019COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN ACTION
Date: March 27, 2019ISSUED SUMMONS
Date: March 27, 2019PTLIF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS
Date: August 15, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2019ORDER GRANTING PLTIF'S MOT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS
Date: August 21, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 15, 2020REQUEST FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE
Date: November 20, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: January 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 11/7/2019 | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 10/31/2019 | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLTIF'S MOT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | PTLIF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.