Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lennox Industries Inc A Delawa, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Fisher, Stacey Samantha, against Madison Ac And Heating Inc, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with Andrew J. Decker, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew J. Decker, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2016 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 8/10/2018 0800 AM Judge ANDREW DECKER results Disposed on 8/10/2018 | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/10/2018 at 0800 AM, MX - Judge ANDREW DECKER presiding. | |
June 09, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND NOT OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: DECKER , ANDREW Assigned | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | FILED COMPLAINT | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case 402016CA000137CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/21/2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.