Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Baggett, Terria Danyelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Baggett, Jeremy Edgar, in the jurisdiction of Liberty County, FL, . Liberty County, FL Superior Courts with FRANK, DAVID MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 06, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLiberty County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PARENTING COURSE CERTIFICATE | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | INITIAL CONTACT LETTER | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE- 10/17/23 | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: FRANK , DAVID assigned | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 392023DR000114DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/6/2023 | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $25.00 | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $25.00 Balance Remaining $25.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.