Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Atlantic Credit And Finance Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ford, Andrew A, against Vincent Newkirk, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time235 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED B Y PLAINTIFF Not Applicable |
|
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 8/31/09 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 29 | |
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FLING COMPLAINT OSC ISSUED |
|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE NAME OF PARTY VINCENT NEWKIRK Not Applicable |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE: BLUE Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.