Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Clark, Joseph, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Lewis, Linton, in the jurisdiction of Liberty County, FL, . Liberty County, FL Superior Courts with FRANK, DAVID MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLiberty County, FL |
|
FOUND INDIGENT BY CLERK
Date: May 27, 2021SUMMONS REQUESTED
Date: May 27, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: July 06, 2021APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS
Date: May 27, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK WITH DIFFERENTIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ATTACHED
Date: May 27, 2021PROPOSED ORDER ENTRY GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: September 02, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 27, 2021ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: November 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER ENTRY GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 8/26/2021 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge DAVID FRANK presiding. | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE DOCUMENTS FILED BY ATTORNEY WHO IS NOT LICENSED TO PRACTICE LAW IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00 | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | FOUND INDIGENT BY CLERK | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.