Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Messer, Teresa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Messer, Herbert, in the jurisdiction of Liberty County, FL, . Liberty County, FL Superior Courts with HOSFORD, KENNETH LAMAR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLiberty County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING scheduled on 5/14/2019 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge KENNETH HOSFORD presiding. | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: HOSFORD , KENNETH L assigned | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 392019DR000041DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019 | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2019000684 | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | RECEIPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.