Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Leon County. This case was filed in Leon County Superior Courts with Angela C. Dempsey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAngela C. Dempsey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLeon County, FL |
|
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-AMERICOR FUNDING LLC
Date: April 12, 2023PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1704137
Date: April 10, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 07, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 07, 2023MOTION
Date: April 07, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2023DEFENDANT AMERICOR FUNDING D/B/A/ AMERICOR FINANCIALS NOTICE OF REMOVAL
Date: April 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT AMERICOR FUNDING D/B/A/ AMERICOR FINANCIALS NOTICE OF REMOVAL | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-AMERICOR FUNDING LLC | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1704137 | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-04-10 | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.