Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Leon County. This case was filed in Leon County Superior Courts with DEMPSEY, ANGELA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2022 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure Non-Homestead Residential More Than $50,000 But Less Than $250,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLeon County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - ALFRED BRUMBLEY
Date: September 29, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - SANDRA ALLEN
Date: September 21, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - DANNY TYE
Date: September 21, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - PEGGIE CORNISH
Date: September 21, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 18, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: September 13, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: September 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 06, 2022PAYMENT $170.00 RECEIPT #1661514
Date: September 08, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2022AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2022MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2022ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: August 30, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: August 26, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: August 19, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: August 26, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWING THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS
Date: August 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: August 02, 2022NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED
Date: July 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2022NOTICE OF VIRTUAL/TELEPHONIC HEARING
Date: July 11, 2022DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST
Date: June 10, 2022DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST
Date: June 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- D HUNT
Date: May 11, 2022RECEIPT # 1634474 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $982.50
Date: April 25, 2022PAYMENT $977.50 RECEIPT #1634474
Date: April 25, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 24, 2022CERTIFICATE
Date: April 24, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: April 24, 2022LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR 5726.1568 / 20220027820)
Date: April 24, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 24, 2022IN REM FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - Recorded (OR 5909.1524 / 20230066442)
Date: December 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: December 13, 2023ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND AD LITEM FEES
Date: December 15, 2023PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #1752522
Date: December 14, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: December 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2023NOTICE OF SALE (EF FEE RECEIVED)
Date: December 13, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT (CLERK NOTE: DEFAULT NOT PROVIDED)
Date: December 12, 2023PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND AD LITEM FEES
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2023PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE
Date: November 02, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 26, 2023MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH
Date: October 15, 2023PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR IN REM SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: August 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 15, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: July 20, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - T DANIEL
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS
Date: July 20, 2023ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: June 19, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 24, 2023PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1709081
Date: May 02, 2023CIVIL FEE LATE LETTER (E-MAILED)
Date: April 25, 2023PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #1707719
Date: April 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2023VERIFIED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR IN REM FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE
Date: April 24, 2023ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR MAY 8 2023
Date: April 24, 2023PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER STRIKING NON-JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR MAY 8 2023
Date: April 21, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: April 03, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: March 29, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 27, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: February 17, 2023ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: February 07, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 16, 2023NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-UNKNOWN HEIRS ESTATE OF J BRUMBLEY
Date: January 19, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-UNKNOWN HEIRS ESTATE OF O SCAROROUGH
Date: January 19, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - K BROCK
Date: January 09, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - J BRUMBLEY
Date: January 09, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - O SCARBOROUGH
Date: January 09, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - M BURNS
Date: January 09, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - C ADAMS
Date: January 09, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - H BRADEN
Date: January 09, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2022PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #1682411
Date: December 28, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 27, 2022AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH - M BURNS
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH - O SCARBOROUGH
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH - J BRUMBLEY
Date: November 23, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - D COLLINS
Date: November 17, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2022GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT AND TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE OF FILING LOAN DOCUMENTS (ORIGINAL)
Date: November 15, 2022PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND AD LITEM FEES FILED BY GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: November 15, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED HEIR J BRUMBLEY
Date: November 14, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED O SCARBOROUGH
Date: November 14, 2022NOTICE OF FILING - LOAN DOCUMENTS
Date: November 09, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - M TYE
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE
Date: October 26, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - K S TAYLOR
Date: October 26, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - F ATCHISON
Date: October 10, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - J KELLY
Date: October 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF EVASION
Date: October 06, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - R BRUMBLEY
Date: September 30, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - GENE BRUMBLEY
Date: September 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND AD LITEM FEES | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #1752522 | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR 02/13/2024 AT 11:00 AM IN 100, JDG: FORECLOSURE SALE | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | IN REM FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - Recorded (OR 5909.1524 / 20230066442) | |
December 13, 2023 | Hearing | MOTION HEARING | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE (EF FEE RECEIVED) | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT (CLERK NOTE: DEFAULT NOT PROVIDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.