Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Merilee Domanick filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kenneth Miller, against Florida Heart Associates Pl, Kenneth Towe, Sara Dube, represented by Tyler Batteese, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Keith R Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeith R Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2024 |
CategoryCa Malpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Merilee Domanick, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Darrell Domanick, against Kenneth M. Towe, M.D., Sara Dube, P.A., and Florida Heart Associates, PL. The complaint alleges negligence in the ...
Certificate of Non-Objection
Date: April 12, 2024Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 05, 2024Notice of Production from Non-Party
Date: April 01, 2024Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 22, 2024Amended Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 21, 2024Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 19, 2024Response to Request For Production
Date: March 13, 2024Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 13, 2024Response to Request For Production
Date: March 08, 2024Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 08, 2024Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: February 23, 2024Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 20, 2024Reply
Date: February 15, 2024Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 12, 2024Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: February 12, 2024Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: February 12, 2024Request for Production
Date: February 12, 2024Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: January 24, 2024Standing Order in Circuit Civil Cases
Date: January 16, 2024Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2024Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: January 08, 2024Summons Submitted for Issuance - New Case Issued
Date: January 08, 2024Complaint
Date: January 08, 2024Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2024Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Non-Objection | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Production from Non-Party | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Response to Request For Production | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Response to Request For Production | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.