Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Josette Sanon, Rogemond Edmond, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Kenneth Duboff, against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company, represented by David Thornton, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Joseph C Fuller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryCa Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 18, 2022Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding
Date: March 07, 2022Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration
Date: March 04, 2022Agreed Case Management Plan and Order
Date: March 04, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 21, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 17, 2022Motion for Relief
Date: February 17, 2022Reply
Date: December 21, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: December 21, 2021Request for Production
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: December 21, 2021Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 21, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: December 13, 2021Order of Dismissal
Date: December 14, 2021Minutes
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Filing Attached Documents
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 14, 2021Response and Objection to Request for Production
Date: June 21, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 21, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 21, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 08, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: May 13, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 13, 2021Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: May 13, 2021Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: April 30, 2021Standing Order in Civil Cases
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: April 09, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: April 09, 2021Request for Production
Date: April 09, 2021Complaint
Date: April 09, 2021Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: April 09, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: April 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreed Case Management Plan and Order | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Relief | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.