Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joseph Welsh, Patricia Welsh, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Hershal Spangler, against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company, represented by Cary Capper, Hershal Spangler, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Joseph C Fuller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph C Fuller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCa Contracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is a civil cover sheet filed in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. The plaintiffs, Joseph M Welsh and Patricia D Welsh, are suing Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company. The estimated amount of the ...
Order of Dismissal
Date: January 27, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 15, 2021Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: January 26, 2022Notice of Non-Binding Arbitration
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: July 20, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 15, 2021Response to Request For Production
Date: July 15, 2021Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding
Date: July 01, 2021Case Management Plan and Order
Date: June 30, 2021Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 26, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 11, 2021Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 15, 2021Request for Production
Date: February 08, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: February 08, 2021Request for Production
Date: January 19, 2021Standing Order in Civil Cases
Date: January 20, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: January 19, 2021Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: January 29, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: January 29, 2021Complaint
Date: January 19, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Binding Arbitration | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request For Production | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.