Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jack Curren, Nancy Curren, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jared Davis, against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Chelsea Maukonen, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Leigh Frizzell Hayes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeigh Frizzell Hayes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCa Contracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Jack Curren and Nancy Curren against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company for breach of contract. The plaintiffs seek damages in excess of $30,000, exclusive of interest, attorneys' fees, and costs. The defendant is...
Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 16, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 24, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: March 16, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: March 16, 2022Subpoena
Date: March 16, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 24, 2022Notice of Service
Date: March 09, 2022Request for Production
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Service
Date: March 18, 2022Witness List
Date: March 19, 2022Request for Production
Date: March 16, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 24, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 08, 2022Cover Letter
Date: February 25, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 25, 2022Agreed Order
Date: February 25, 2022Witness and Exhibit List
Date: February 04, 2022Witness List
Date: February 04, 2022Order Scheduling Non-Binding Arbitration
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 26, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: December 13, 2021Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 23, 2021Amended Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 24, 2021Case Management Plan and Order
Date: October 29, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 24, 2021Response to Request For Production
Date: September 24, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 27, 2021Correspondence
Date: June 23, 2021Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Change of Attorney
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 12, 2021Privilege Log
Date: April 12, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: April 27, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: April 27, 2021Request for Production
Date: April 27, 2021Response to Request For Production
Date: April 12, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 12, 2021Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 29, 2021Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 23, 2021Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 17, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 10, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 15, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: February 11, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 19, 2021Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: January 19, 2021Standing Order in Civil Cases
Date: January 21, 2021Order of Reassignment
Date: February 05, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: January 19, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: January 19, 2021Request for Production
Date: January 19, 2021Complaint
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Subpoena |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.