Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cindy Nalyd, Ric Nalyd, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Margaret Garner, against Asi Preferred Insurance Corp, represented by Margaret Garner, Tracy Jurgus, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Leigh Frizzell Hayes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeigh Frizzell Hayes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCa Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is a civil cover sheet filed in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. The plaintiffs, Ric Nalyd and Cindy Nalyd, are suing the defendant, Asi Preferred Insurance Corp. The estimated amount of the c...
Notice of Cancellation of Deposition
Date: March 18, 2022Mediation Report
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: March 18, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: March 18, 2022Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding
Date: March 18, 2022Notice of Production from Non-Party
Date: March 17, 2022Certificate/Certification of Authority
Date: March 11, 2022Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: March 11, 2022Request for Production
Date: March 09, 2022Cover Letter
Date: February 25, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: March 09, 2022Witness List
Date: March 08, 2022Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 25, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Non-Binding Arbitration
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 15, 2022Witness List
Date: February 07, 2022Witness List
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 27, 2022Amended Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 25, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 08, 2021Response to Request For Production
Date: December 08, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 04, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 08, 2021Privilege Log
Date: December 08, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: December 01, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 29, 2021Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration
Date: October 29, 2021Response to Request For Production
Date: September 15, 2021Case Management Plan and Order
Date: October 29, 2021Correspondence
Date: June 28, 2021Notice of Cancellation of Deposition
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 21, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 07, 2021Minutes
Date: June 21, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 23, 2021Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 16, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: March 11, 2021Request for Production
Date: March 11, 2021Order of Reassignment
Date: February 05, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 15, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: March 11, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: January 25, 2021Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: January 25, 2021Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: January 19, 2021Standing Order in Civil Cases
Date: January 20, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: January 19, 2021Request for Production
Date: January 19, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: January 19, 2021Complaint
Date: January 19, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Deposition | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Production from Non-Party | |
March 14, 2022 | Hearing |
CANCELLED-Other Circuit Civil Court
Judge: Hayes, Leigh Frizzell |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate/Certification of Authority | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.