Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Luis Lopez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sheryl Lopez, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Lee Ann Schreiber presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Default Issued | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Default for Entry by Clerk | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference02-28-20 @ 9:30 | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice of Action w/ Copy of Complaint Mailed mailed to last known address in affidavit of diligent search | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Action- Posted | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | LOPEZ, SHERYL JANETH - Certificate of Posting | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Standing Temporary Order for Dissolution of Marriage | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Application for Indigency - New CaseIndigent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.