Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Caliber Home Loans Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Gladys Herrera, Mayelin Lopez-Castillo, Unknown Spouse Of Gladys Esther Castillo, Unknown Spouse Of Mayelin Lopez-Castillo, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Keith R Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCa Homestead Residential Foreclosure 2: $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a Notice of Submitting Fla.Stat.§ 702.015(4) Certification filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. against Gladys Esther Castillo Herrera and Mayelin Lopez-Castillo in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in and for Lee Cou...
Summons Submitted for Issuance - New Case Issued
Date: December 31, 2019Voluntary Dismissal
Date: October 02, 2020Release of Lis Pendens
Date: June 04, 2020Return of Service on Summons Unserved
Date: January 23, 2020Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: January 23, 2020Standing Order in Residential Foreclosure Cases
Date: January 02, 2020Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: December 31, 2019Final Disposition Form
Date: June 03, 2020Notice for Homestead Foreclosure Cases
Date: January 02, 2020Certificate of Possession of Note
Date: December 31, 2019Complaint
Date: December 31, 2019Attachments/Exhibits to Pleading
Date: December 31, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2019Value of Claim Calculation Sheet
Date: December 31, 2019Voluntary Dismissal
Date: June 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Release of Lis Pendens | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons Unserved | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons Served | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Standing Order in Residential Foreclosure Cases | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice for Homestead Foreclosure Cases | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Submitted for Issuance - New Case Issued | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.