Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Alane C. Laboda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
|
This complaint document is related to a real property or mortgage foreclosure claim in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. The plaintiff is JAJ DONG HOMES INC. and the defendants are CARLOS A.M. DA COSTA, et al...
Final Judgment
Date: July 07, 2020Minutes
Date: July 06, 2020Answer of Guardian, Administration and Atty Ad Litem
Date: June 15, 2020Order Appointing Guardian, Administrator and Atty Ad Litem
Date: June 03, 2020Notice of Service
Date: May 26, 2020Notice of Filing Attached Documents
Date: May 26, 2020Affidavit in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 14, 2020Default Issued
Date: May 11, 2020Default for Entry by Clerk
Date: May 11, 2020Motion for Default
Date: May 11, 2020Proof of Publication - Notice of Action
Date: April 27, 2020Returned Mail
Date: April 24, 2020Returned Mail
Date: April 16, 2020Returned Mail
Date: April 15, 2020Returned Mail
Date: April 13, 2020Motion to Appoint Guardian, Administrator and Atty Ad Litem
Date: March 26, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 26, 2020Hidvegi, Martha - Summons (20 day) Issued
Date: March 24, 2020Spriggs, Dein P - Summons (20 day) Issued
Date: March 24, 2020Reynolds, James R - Summons (20 day) Issued
Date: March 24, 2020Copy of Notice of Action with Mailing (Real Property)
Date: March 16, 2020Notice of Action with Mailing (Real Property)
Date: March 12, 2020Affidavits of Diligent Search/Constructive Service
Date: March 12, 2020Robbins, Gary D - Summons (20 day) Issued
Date: February 19, 2020Default Issued
Date: February 18, 2020Affidavit of Non-Military Service/Military Service
Date: February 18, 2020Default for Entry by Clerk
Date: February 18, 2020Motion for Default
Date: February 18, 2020Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: February 07, 2020Answer
Date: February 07, 2020Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: February 07, 2020Return of Service on Summons Unserved
Date: February 03, 2020Tarpon IV LLC - Summons (20 day) Issued
Date: February 03, 2020Fifth Third Mortgage Company - Summons (20 day) Is
Date: February 03, 2020Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: January 27, 2020Return of Service on Summons Unserved
Date: January 27, 2020Echezarreta, Antonio - Summons (20 day) Issued
Date: January 22, 2020Rekasi, Sandra - Summons (20 day) Issued
Date: January 22, 2020PNC Bank NA - Summons (20 day) Issued
Date: January 22, 2020Standing Order in Civil Cases
Date: January 02, 2020Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: December 31, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: December 31, 2019Complaint
Date: December 31, 2019Value of Claim Calculation Sheet
Date: December 31, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer of Guardian, Administration and Atty Ad Litem | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian, Administrator and Atty Ad Litem | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Attached Documents | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Default Issued | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Default for Entry by Clerk | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.