Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ashley Harris, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Edward Anzalone, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Judge Assigned No presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2016 |
CategoryUifsa Foreign Registration |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Termination of IV-D ServicesProcessed in CSE | |
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk of Court Action Request | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Credit/Debit Notice | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Credit/Debit Notice | |
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Registration Statement | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Requestto Register | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Social Security Number (Secured) | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Demographic Information Sheet by DOR | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Registration of Foreign Support Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.