Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cecelia Beaudry, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jeffrey Vansickle, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with John S Carlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryRepeat Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Application for Determination of Civil Indigent Status | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit on Possession of Firearms | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Limited Appearance | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.