Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Annie Maybin, State Of Florida Dor, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Wesnel Isaac, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Lee Ann Schreiber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee Ann Schreiber Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryDor Paternity/Disestablishment Of Paternity |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Cert Statement Sent to Vital Stats | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Certified Copy of FJ Sent to Office of Vital Statistics | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Recommended Order By Hearing Officer | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
February 20, 2017 | Hearing | ||
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Jury Trialand Notice to Produce | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing2-20-17 at 9am | |
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Issued | |
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.