Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
David Stutzman filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with James R Shenko presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Discharge | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Waiver, Consent & Receipt | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Inventory | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Inventory | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication to Creditors | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.