Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
California Casualty Indemnity Exchange filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Evelyn Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Alane C Laboda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryCa Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by California Casualty Indemnity Civil Division, acting as the subrogee of Ashley Childers, against Evelyn Rosa Garcia in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. The plaintiff, an insurance ...
Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: March 01, 2017Motion for Default
Date: May 23, 2017Response to Request For Production
Date: June 16, 2017Affidavit of Non-Military Service/Military Service
Date: May 23, 2017Standing Order in Civil Cases
Date: December 28, 2016Complaint
Date: December 27, 2016Notice of Filing
Date: June 09, 2017Voluntary Dismissal
Date: April 13, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 27, 2016Default Issued
Date: June 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Response to Request For Production | |
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Issued | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Military Service/Military Service | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons Served | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Standing Order in Civil Cases | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.