Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lea Vandergriff, against Duane Panty, Gregory Lyons, Jeremy Panty, Lawrence Lyons, Unknown Heirs Et Al, (total of 6) See All represented by Lea Vandergriff, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Keith R Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
CategoryCa Homestead Residential Foreclosure 3: $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned Served | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued frwd to LCSO | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Order for Writ of Possession | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Writ of Possession | |
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issuedsold to pltf $180,200 | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.