Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jason Mankoff, against Cristina Petrone, Michael Petrone, Suntrust Bank, Unknown Parties, Unknown Spouse Of Cristina Petrone, (total of 6) See All represented by Jason Mankoff, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Keith R Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
CategoryCa Homestead Residential Foreclosure 3: $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issuedsold to pltf $195,100 | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Clerk's Review | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale Issued | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Attached DocumentsNote&Mtg |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.