Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ada Nicklaus, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Javier Calix, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Amy R Hawthorne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction Extended for Hearing (2nd) 2/10/16 @ 1:00 PM | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum to Judge | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Testimony of Minor | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served with Firearm Affidavit | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Party Information |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.