Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kimberly Roman, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Anthony Laguardia, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Lisa S Porter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Confidential Filing of Address | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Denying Issuance of an Order to Show Cause | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition for Order to Show Cause for Violation of Injunction | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction Returned Served | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit on Possession of Firearms | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Limitation of Services Provided |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.