Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Stephanie Wagner, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Andrew Sosa, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with John S Carlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Order at Arraignment | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served | |
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Return of Service Unserved | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause03/09/2016 @ 12:45 PM | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause02/10/2016 @ 12:45 PM | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Party Information |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.