Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brian Jakacki, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Emily Bramowicz, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Lee Ann Schreiber presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryPrivate Paternity/Disestablishment Of Paternity |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Evidence Destroyed Pursuant to Notice | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Financial Affidavit | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dispose of Evidence | |
March 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Family Court
Judge: Schreiber, Lee Ann |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Attached Documents | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Response to Motion | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 3/27/17 @ 11:00 am |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.