Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Richard Barr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Michelle Barr, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Lisa S Porter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
January 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Family Court
Judge: Cary, G Keith |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing01/21/20 @ 10:45 | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Issuedagainst Michelle Barr | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Defaultagainst Michelle Barr | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to StayRichard Barr | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons ServedMichelle Barr | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of UnavailabilityNicole Spence, Esq. o/b/o Richard Barr |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.