Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sean Ramsey, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jeannine Rust, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with John S Carlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum to Judge | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Default Issued | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Action | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference1/21/16 @ 10:00 | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Actionamended | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Action without MailingAmended | |
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Standing Temporary Order for Dissolution of Marriage | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.