Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Carmen Rodriguez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Neville Rivera, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Lee Ann Schreiber presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Report and Recommended Final Judgment | |
March 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Family Court
Judge: Perez, Gilberto |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Cancellation of Conference Memo | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial and Order of Referral to General Magistrate3/16/16 @ 11:00 | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion of Parenting Program | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.