Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brown Brothers Harriman Trust Company Na filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Alane C Laboda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Waiver, Consent & Receipt | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge | |
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time to File Discharge | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Extension to File Discharge | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Inventory | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Federal Estate Tax Return Due | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Inventory | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time to File Inventory | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition for Extension to File Inventory |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.