Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Charles Wasitis, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against David Harley, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2015 |
CategoryCa Trust Litigation |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Request to Produce | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defenses | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons ServedDavid Harley | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Standing Order in Civil Cases |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.