Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Karrie Mccowen, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mitchell Mccowen, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Amy R Hawthorne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction Extended for Hearing 2/17/15 @ 12:45 PM | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Supplemental Affidavit | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance with Designation | |
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance with Designation Amended | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction Returned Served | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.