Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thomas Russo, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Leigh Frizzell Hayes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySummary Administration, Estate $1000 Or More |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service | |
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Creditor Claim | |
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Creditor Claim | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Checklist | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Admitting Foreign Will to Record | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Joinder Waiver and Consent | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition to Admit Foreign Will | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Authenticated Transcript - Recorded | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.