Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Linder Industrial Machinery Company, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Joseph Rodriguez, Mse Systems Inc, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Jay B. Rosman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCa Contracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Order on Contempt | |
February 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Circuit Civil Court
Judge: Rosman, Jay B |
|
February 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
February 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Order on Contempt | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause02/15/16 @ 3:00 | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Show Cause | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
September 21, 2015 | Hearing |
Circuit Civil Court
Judge: Rosman, Jay B |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.