Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bernice Lopez filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Elisabeth Adams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Current Address | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Limitation of Services Provided | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Cancellation of Conference Memo | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Special Interrogatories | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance with Mandatory Disclosure | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer and Waiver | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Social Security Number (Secured) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.