Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brian Stine filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Amy R Hawthorne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Standing Order for Compliance Review Conference | |
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Compliance Conference Checklist | |
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Standing Order for Compliance Review Conference reset | |
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion to Stay | |
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to stay | |
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion to Stay | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Reports | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance with Mandatory Disclosure | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion of Parenting Program |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.