Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Martha Suarez, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with John S Carlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2007 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Certified Copy of FJ Sent to Office of Vital Statistics | |
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Report Mailed | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Certified Copy of FJ Sent to Office of Vital Statistics | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Answer and Waiver Amended | |
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Standing Order of Paternity | |
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Standing Order for Case Status Conference | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Social Security Number (Secured) | |
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Current Address | |
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance with Mandatory Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.