Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Paula Valverde filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Lisa S Porter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2007 |
CategoryRepeat Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction Returned Not Served | |
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Additional Information Request from LCSO | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction Returned Not Served | |
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction Extended for Service amended 7/16/08 @ 9am | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Out of County Service Information Sheet | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Additional Information for Service | |
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction Extended for Service 5th 7/17/08 @ 9am | |
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction Extended for Service 4th 4/17/08 @ 115pm | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction Extended for Service 3rd 3/18/08 @ 915am |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.